Constitution Committee
31st Mar 2022 - 20th Apr 2023
Committee on Issue of Privilege (Police Searches on Parliamentary Estate)
13th Jul 2009 - 6th May 2010
Leader of Her Majesty's Official Opposition
6th Nov 2003 - 6th Dec 2005
Leader of the Conservative Party
6th Nov 2003 - 6th Dec 2005
Leader of HM Official Opposition
6th Nov 2003 - 6th Dec 2005
Shadow Chancellor of the Exchequer
9th Jan 2001 - 6th Nov 2003
Shadow Secretary of State
11th Jun 1997 - 15th Jun 1999
Home Secretary
27th May 1993 - 1st May 1997
Secretary of State for Environment
11th Apr 1992 - 26th May 1993
Secretary of State for Employment
2nd Jan 1990 - 10th Apr 1992
Minister of State (Department of Environment) (Housing)
25th Jul 1989 - 2nd Jan 1990
Minister of State (Department of Environment) (Planning)
25th Jul 1988 - 23rd Jul 1989
Minister of State (Department of Environment) (Local Government)
13th Jun 1987 - 24th Jul 1988
Parliamentary Under-Secretary (Department of Trade and Industry)
2nd Sep 1985 - 13th Jun 1987